VA HB166 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-29 - Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-29 - Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Education; guidance and resources; Department of Education; guidance and resources; composting programs in local school divisions. Requires the Department of Education to develop, post in a publicly accessible format and location on its website, and make available to any school board, upon request, guidance and resources relating to the establishment of local experiential learning programs on the composting of organic material, including food waste, for sustainable purposes such as horticulture or micro-farming, including guidance and resources on available grants and other sources of funding for such programs.
Title
Guidance and resources; composting programs in local school divisions.
Sponsors
Del. Karen Keys-Gamarra [D] | Del. Alex Askew [D] | Del. Nadarius Clark [D] | Del. Rozia Henson [D] |
Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. Irene Shin [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (58-Y 40-N) (Y: 58 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (58-Y 40-N) (Y: 58 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment(s) (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (58-Y 40-N) (Y: 58 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (58-Y 40-N) (Y: 58 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment(s) (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-29 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Assigned Education and Health Sub: Public Education |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-01-23 | House | VOTE: Passage (58-Y 40-N) |
2024-01-23 | House | Read third time and passed House (58-Y 40-N) |
2024-01-22 | House | Printed as engrossed 24101864D-E |
2024-01-22 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB166E |
2024-01-22 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2024-01-22 | House | Read second time |
2024-01-19 | House | Read first time |
2024-01-17 | House | Reported from Education with amendment(s) (15-Y 6-N) |
2024-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 1-N) |
2024-01-15 | House | Assigned Education sub: K-12 |
2024-01-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2024-01-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24101864D |