VA HB1658 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Introduced on November 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Vote by mail; pilot program. Requires the Department of Elections to develop a pilot program for conducting elections by mail. In a vote-by-mail election, a ballot is mailed to every registered voter, and the ballots are returned by the voters by mailing the ballot to the office of the general registrar, by delivering the ballot in person to the office of the general registrar, or by depositing the ballot at a drop-off location. The bill allows any county or city to apply to participate in the pilot program, subject to approval by the State Board, and requires participating localities to provide a report on the pilot program in its locality to the State Board by December 1 of each year in which it participates. The bill requires the State Board to submit a report to the Governor, the General Assembly, and the House and Senate Committees on Privileges and Elections on the pilot program, including a recommendation as to whether all elections in the Commonwealth should be conducted by mail. The bill has an expiration date of December 31, 2022.
Title
Vote by mail; Department of Elections to develop a pilot program.
Sponsors
Del. Debra Rodman [D] | Del. Hala Ayala [D] | Sen. Lamont Bagby [D] | Del. Jeffrey Bourne [D] |
Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. Lee Carter [D] | Del. Karrie Delaney [D] | Del. Wendy Gooditis [D] |
Del. Elizabeth Guzman [D] | Del. C.E. Hayes [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Chris Hurst [D] |
Del. Mark Keam [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Paul Krizek [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] |
Del. Joesph Lindsey [D] | Del. Delores McQuinn [D] | Del. Michael Mullin [D] | Del. Kenneth Plum [D] |
Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. David Reid [D] | Sen. Danica Roem [D] | Del. Marcus Simon [D] |
Del. Richard Sullivan [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (6-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-12 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-11-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2018-11-30 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101015D |