VA HB1643 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0073)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0073)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Protective orders; exempt from stay pending appeal. Clarifies that a protective order entered due to a violation of an initial protective order shall remain in effect upon petition for or the pendency of an appeal. The bill also includes family abuse protective orders issued in conjunction with a family abuse disposition among other protective orders that are not stayed upon appeal. This bill is a recommendation of the Committee on District Courts.
Title
Protective orders; exempt from stay pending appeal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0073) | |
2013-03-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 73 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-14 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-14 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1643ER) |
2013-02-14 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-01-22 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-22 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-21 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-01-18 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-16 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-10 | House | Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal |
2013-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13100998D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1016 (Same As) 2013-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0097)