VA HB1642 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 20 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-17 - Senate: Stricken at request of patron in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 20 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-17 - Senate: Stricken at request of patron in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Dental school faculty; licensure. Provides that the Board of Dentistry may issue a faculty license to a faculty member of an accredited dental program who is (i) a graduate of a dental school or college or dental department of a college or university, is licensed to practice dentistry in another state and has never been licensed in Virginia, or (ii) a graduate of a dental school or college or dental department of a college or university, has completed an advanced dental education program, and has never been licensed in Virginia. This bill also provides that faculty licenses issued by the Board and temporary licenses issued by the Board for persons enrolled in advanced dental education programs, serving as dental interns or residents, or post-doctoral certificate or degree candidates shall be for patient care activities associated with the educational program and that take place within facilities owned or operated by or affiliated with the dental school or program.
Title
Dental school faculty; licensure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Stricken at request of patron in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-17 | Senate: Stricken at request of patron in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Assigned Education sub: Health Licensing | |
2011-01-24 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2011-01-24 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-01-21 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-21 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (94-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-20 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1642H1 | |
2011-01-20 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 11104266D-H1 | |
2011-01-20 | House: Read second time | |
2011-01-19 | House: Read first time | |
2011-01-18 | House: Committee substitute printed 11104266D-H1 | |
2011-01-18 | House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-17 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-13 | House: Assigned HWI sub: #1 | |
2011-01-10 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2011-01-10 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102647D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 2709 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2711.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2713 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2714.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |