VA HB164 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 2 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-01 - Incorporated by General Laws
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 2 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-01 - Incorporated by General Laws
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Procurement; preference for local products and firms by localities. Allows localities to give a procurement preference to a higher bid that includes local products and firms so long as the bid price is not more than 10 percent greater than the bid price of the lowest responsive and responsible bidder.
Title
Procurement; preference for local products and firms by localities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | House | Incorporated by General Laws |
2024-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB1361-Feggans) by voice vote |
2024-01-26 | House | Assigned GL sub: Procurement/Open Government |
2024-01-02 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2024-01-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24100264D |