VA HB1638 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0249)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0249)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Professional and Occupational Regulation, Department of Health Professions, and related regulatory boards; disclosure of information regarding examinations, licensure, certification, registration, or permitting. Allows the Department of Professional and Occupational Regulation, the Department of Health Professions, and professional, occupational, and health regulatory boards to mail or email upon request records regarding applications for admission to examinations or for licensure, certification, registration, or permitting and the related scoring records to the individual to whom such records pertain. Under current law, such records may be made available for copying by the subject individual at the office of the Department or board that possesses the material during normal working hours.
Title
DPOR, et al.; disclosure of certain information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0249) | |
2023-03-22 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 249 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-02 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-02-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-02-16 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1638ER) |
2023-02-16 | House | Enrolled |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Read third time |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-01-30 | House | VOTE: (100-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-27 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2023-01-26 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-24 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-16 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2023-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2023-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23100980D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1060 (Same As) 2023-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0250)
SB1060 (Same As) 2023-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0250)
SB1060 (Same As) 2023-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0250)