VA HB1638 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1059)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1059)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Institutional racial segregation and discrimination. Repeals several Acts of Assembly from 1901 to 1960 that contain provisions that implemented and enforced racial segregation and discrimination in public facilities and common carriers, on public documents, and within the office of the State Registrar.
Title
Institutional racial segregation and discrimination; repeals several Acts.
Sponsors
Del. Alex Askew [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1059) | |
2020-04-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1059 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1638ER) |
2020-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from Rules (10-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-06 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-31 | House | Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-01-16 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20102522D |
Same As/Similar To
SB722 (Same As) 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1060)