VA HB1632 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Eligibility for TANF; drug-related felonies. Provides that a person who is otherwise eligible to receive TANF assistance shall not be denied assistance solely because he has been convicted of a felony offense of possession of a controlled substance provided he complies with all obligations imposed by the court, has completed substance abuse treatment, and participates in drug screenings.
Title
TANF; eligibility of assistance when convicted of drug-related felonies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | House: Left in Courts of Justice | |
2011-01-20 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-01-20 | House: Referred from Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote | |
2011-01-13 | House: Assigned HWI sub: #2 | |
2011-01-10 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2011-01-10 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101873D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HB1632 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB1632+hil |