VA HB1630 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Cell phone use while driving prohibited. Prohibits operation of a motor vehicle while using a cell phone or other wireless telecommunications device, other than a citizens band radio, in any manner. The offense would be a secondary offense punishable as a Class 3 misdemeanor when the operator of the motor vehicle is charged with any other moving violation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cell phones or other wireless telecommunications devices; prohibited use while driving, exception.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-02-08 House: Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
2011-01-20 House: Subcommittee recommends no action by voice vote
2011-01-18 House: Assigned MPPS sub: #2
2011-01-10 House: Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
2011-01-10 House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101044D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4621078.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback