VA HB1627 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-02 - Tabled in Education by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-02 - Tabled in Education by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Economics education and financial literacy; credit; alternative assessment. Requires the Board of Education, in establishing course and credit requirements for a high school diploma, to award one standard unit of credit to and exempt from the requirement to receive instruction in economics education and financial literacy any student who demonstrates mastery of the subject by achieving a satisfactory score on an assessment developed or adopted by the Board.
Title
Economics education and financial literacy; standard unit of credit, alternative assessment.
Sponsors
Del. Robert Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 4-N) (Y: 5 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-02 | House | Tabled in Education by voice vote |
2015-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 4-N) |
2015-01-16 | House | Assigned Education sub: Elementary and Secondary Education |
2015-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2015-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102032D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 1 | 200.03 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 253.13:4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |