VA HB1620 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 7 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, May 3, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

State Board of Elections; membership; appointment of Commissioner of Elections. Increases the membership of the State Board of Elections from three members to five members and increases the terms of Board members from four years to five years. Representation shall be given to each of the political parties having the highest and next highest number of votes in the Commonwealth at the preceding gubernatorial election, with three Board members being of the party of the Governor. Terms are initially staggered. The bill also grants to the Board the authority to appoint the Commissioner of Elections, subject to confirmation by the General Assembly, and to remove the Commissioner of Elections. The appointment or removal of the Commissioner shall require an affirmative vote of four of the five Board members. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2020. This bill is identical to SB 1455.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections, State Board of; membership, appointment of Commissioner of Elections.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendations #6 and #15 (37-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (47-Y 51-N) (Y: 47 N: 51 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-03 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (51-Y 47-N) (Y: 51 N: 47 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (53-Y 45-N) (Y: 53 N: 45 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (5-Y 93-N) (Y: 5 N: 93 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (33-Y 7-N) (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (8-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 47-N 1-A) (Y: 51 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, May 3, 2019
2019-04-03HouseReenrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 4/3/19
2019-04-03SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2019-04-03HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2019-04-03HouseReenrolled bill text (HB1620ER2)
2019-04-03HouseReenrolled
2019-04-03 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted in-part
2019-04-03SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendations #6 and #15 (37-Y 0-N 1-A)
2019-04-03HouseVOTE: REJECTED (47-Y 51-N)
2019-04-03HouseHouse rejected Governor's recommendation #1-5, 7-14 and 16 (47-Y 51-N)
2019-04-03HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
2019-04-03HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation #6 and 15 (98-Y 0-N)
2019-04-03HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-26HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2019-03-11 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-11HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019
2019-03-09SenateSigned by President
2019-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-07HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1620ER)
2019-03-07HouseEnrolled
2019-02-22HouseVOTE: ADOPTION #2 (51-Y 47-N)
2019-02-22HouseConference report agreed to by House (51-Y 47-N)
2019-02-22HouseReconsideration of conference report agreed to by House
2019-02-22HousePassed by temporarily
2019-02-22HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (53-Y 45-N)
2019-02-22HouseConference report agreed to by House (53-Y 45-N)
2019-02-22SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N)
2019-02-22 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2019-02-21SenateSenators: Vogel, Barker, Chafin
2019-02-21SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2019-02-21HouseDelegates: Ransone, Cole, Rush, Lindsey
2019-02-21HouseConferees appointed by House
2019-02-21HouseHouse acceded to request
2019-02-20SenateSenate requested conference committee
2019-02-20SenateSenate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: REJECTED (5-Y 93-N)
2019-02-19HouseSenate substitute rejected by House 19106755D-S1 (5-Y 93-N)
2019-02-19HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-18SenatePassed Senate with substitute (33-Y 7-N)
2019-02-18SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1620S1
2019-02-18SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19106755D-S1
2019-02-18SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-18SenateRead third time
2019-02-15SenatePassed by for the day
2019-02-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-12SenateCommittee substitute printed 19106755D-S1
2019-02-12SenateReported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (8-Y 2-N 1-A)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 47-N 1-A)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House (51-Y 47-N 1-A)
2019-02-04HouseRead second time and engrossed
2019-02-03HouseRead first time
2019-02-01HouseReported from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 10-N)
2019-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N)
2019-01-12HouseAssigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-10-09HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2018-10-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100589D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22106(n/a)See Bill Text
242102(n/a)See Bill Text
242103(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB1620
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1620+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1620S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1620ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1620ER2+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1801V0019+HB1620
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H18V0015+HB1620
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2449+HB1620
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S08V0110+HB1620
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0662HB1620+HB1620
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0746HB1620+HB1620
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3038+HB1620
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0843HB1620+HB1620
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1055HB1620+HB1620
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3306+HB1620
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3314+HB1620
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3373+HB1620
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3374+HB1620
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1162HB1620+HB1620

Bill Comments

feedback