VA HB1620 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Driving under the influence. Provides that a person cannot be found guilty of driving under the influence if he is in a motor vehicle that is lawfully parked on private residential property owned or leased by such person or on the private residential property of another with the owner's or lessor's permission and the motor of the vehicle is not running. This bill is in response to the Supreme Court of Virginia decision in Sarafin v. Commonwealth, No. 131747 (Oct. 31, 2014).
Title
DUI; person cannot be found guilty if in vehicle that is parked on private residential property.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2015-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2015-01-13 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2015-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100906D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB1620 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB1620+hil |