VA HB1617 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Property transfer; Governor; Virginia School for the Deaf, Blind and Multi-Disabled. Authorizes the Governor to convey certain property held in the name of the board of visitors of the Virginia School for the Deaf, Blind and Multi-Disabled located in Hampton, Virginia, to Insight Enterprises, Inc., for the purpose of providing (i) housing and educational opportunities for disabled youth, (ii) vocational training for disabled youth and adults, and (iii) a technical center for the elderly and disabled.
Title
Virginia School for the Deaf, Blind and Multi-Disabled; Governor to convey certain property.
Sponsors
Del. Jeion Ward [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2011-01-20 | House: Assigned App. sub: Capital Outlay | |
2011-01-19 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-01-19 | House: Referred from Education by voice vote | |
2011-01-07 | House: Referred to Committee on Education | |
2011-01-07 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103048D |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HB1617 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB1617+hil |