VA HB1614 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Closure of the Southwestern Virginia Training Center and the Southeastern Virginia Training Center prohibited. Provides that the Southwestern Virginia Training Center and the Southeastern Virginia Training Center shall not be closed and shall instead remain open and continue to accept new admissions.
Title
Southwestern Va. Training Center & Southeastern Va. Training Center; closure prohibited.
Sponsors
Del. James Morefield [R] | Del. Larry Rush [R] | Del. Israel O'Quinn [R] | Del. Jeffrey Campbell [R] |
Del. James Leftwich [R] | Sen. Todd Pillion [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2015-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2015-01-30 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2015-01-29 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-01-29 | House | Referred from Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote |
2015-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations by voice vote |
2015-01-16 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2015-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2015-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100928D |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB1614 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB1614+hil |