VA HB1614 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Immunizations; human papillomavirus vaccine required for all children. Eliminates language limiting the requirement for the human papillomavirus vaccine to female children, so that all children will be required to be vaccinated against human papillomavirus, with the first dose administered before the child enters the sixth grade, subject to certain exceptions in current law.
Title
Human papillomavirus vaccine; required for all children.
Sponsors
Del. Jeion Ward [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-05 | House | Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2013-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2013-01-11 | House | Assigned HWI sub: #4 |
2013-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2013-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13100151D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+sum+HB1614 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HB1614+hil |