VA HB1610 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0290)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0290)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Public Procurement Act; cooperative procurement; installation of playground equipment. Excludes the installation of playground equipment, including all associated and necessary construction and maintenance, from the prohibition on using cooperative procurement to purchase construction.
Title
Virginia Public Procurement Act; cooperative procurement, installation of playground equipment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (26-Y 14-N) (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 6-N 1-A) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (26-Y 14-N) (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 6-N 1-A) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0290) | |
2023-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 290 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-02 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-02-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-02-16 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1610ER) |
2023-02-16 | House | Enrolled |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (26-Y 14-N) |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Read third time |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 6-N 1-A) |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-01-30 | House | VOTE: (100-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-27 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2023-01-26 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-24 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-11 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2023-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2023-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23102040D |