VA HB1607 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0416)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0416)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Abandonment of an animal; penalty. Decreases from five days to four days the minimum length of time for which failing to provide the elements of basic care constitutes abandonment of an animal. The bill increases from a Class 3 misdemeanor to a Class 1 misdemeanor the penalty for abandonment of an animal.
Title
Abandonment of an animal; penalty.
Sponsors
Del. Matt Fariss [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0416) | |
2018-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 416 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-16 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-16 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 16, 2018 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-08 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1607ER) |
2018-03-08 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (11-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-13 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-02-12 | House | Motion to reconsider rerefer to Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources agreed to |
2018-02-12 | House | Rereferred to Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2018-02-12 | House | Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to |
2018-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-07 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-25 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2018-01-25 | House | Presented and ordered printed 18104421D |
2018-01-25 | House | Unanimous consent to introduce |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 403.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 403.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 6500 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 6504 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |