VA HB1607 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
High school graduation requirements; verified credit; locally selected, nationally recognized high school academic assessments. Requires the Board of Education, in establishing high school graduation requirements, to provide for the award of verified units of credit for satisfactory scores on locally selected, nationally recognized high school academic assessments approved by the Board in lieu of the correlated Standards of Learning assessments.
Title
High school graduation; verified credit, locally selected, recognized academic assessments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Left in Education |
2017-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-13 | House | Assigned Education sub: Education Innovation |
2017-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2017-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102427D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB1607 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1607+hil |