VA HB1605 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - House sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Parental Choice Education Savings Accounts established. Permits the parent of a public preschool, elementary, or secondary school student who meets certain criteria to apply to the school division in which the student resides for a one-year, renewable Parental Choice Education Savings Account that consists of an amount that is equivalent to a certain percentage of all applicable annual Standards of Quality per pupil state funds appropriated for public school purposes and apportioned to the resident school division in which the student resides, including the per pupil share of state sales tax funding in basic aid and any state per pupil share of special education funding to which the student is eligible. The bill permits the parent to use the moneys in such account for certain education-related expenses of the student, including tuition, deposits, fees, and required textbooks at a private, sectarian or nonsectarian elementary or secondary school or preschool that is located in the Commonwealth and does not discriminate on the basis of race, color, or national origin. The bill also contains provisions relating to auditing, rescinding, and reviewing expenses made from such accounts. The bill contains a reenactment clause.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Parental Choice Education Savings Accounts; established, report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (50-Y 49-N) (Y: 50 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (7-Y 4-N) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (49-Y 47-N) (Y: 49 N: 47 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (12-Y 7-N) (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-05HouseHouse sustained Governor's veto
2017-04-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-03-16 Governor: Vetoed by Governor
2017-03-13 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
2017-03-13HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/13/17
2017-03-10SenateSigned by President
2017-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-03-07HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1605ER)
2017-03-07HouseEnrolled
2017-02-22HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (50-Y 49-N)
2017-02-22HouseSenate substitute with amendment agreed to by House 17105590D-S1 (50-Y 49-N)
2017-02-22HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-02-21SenatePassed Senate with substitute with amendment (21-Y 19-N)
2017-02-21SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment HB1605S1
2017-02-21SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2017-02-21SenateReading of amendment waived
2017-02-21SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 17105590D-S1
2017-02-21SenateReading of substitute waived
2017-02-21SenateRead third time
2017-02-20SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-16SenateReported from Finance with amendment (7-Y 4-N)
2017-02-16SenateRereferred to Finance
2017-02-16SenateCommittee substitute printed 17105590D-S1
2017-02-16SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (8-Y 7-N)
2017-02-08SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2017-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2017-02-07HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (49-Y 47-N)
2017-02-07HouseRead third time and passed House (49-Y 47-N)
2017-02-06HousePrinted as engrossed 17100986D-E
2017-02-06HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB1605E
2017-02-06HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2017-02-06HouseRead second time
2017-02-03HouseRead first time
2017-02-01HouseReported from Appropriations (12-Y 7-N)
2017-01-31HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N)
2017-01-25HouseAssigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education
2017-01-25HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2017-01-25HouseReported from Education with amendment (12-Y 9-N)
2017-01-24HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (4-Y 3-N)
2017-01-13HouseAssigned Education sub: Education Innovation
2017-01-03HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2017-01-03HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100986D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221222.1(n/a)See Bill Text
221222.5(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB1605
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1605+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1605E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1605S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1605ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H0903V0002+HB1605
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H09V0063+HB1605
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H0204V0005+HB1605
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H02V0032+HB1605
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2048+HB1605
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S04V0280+HB1605
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S05V0317+HB1605
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0735HB1605+HB1605
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0791HB1605+HB1605
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2703+HB1605

Bill Comments

feedback