VA HB1591 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on February 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0013)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on February 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0013)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Economic Development Partnership Authority; site and building assessment program; minimum size of industrial sites. Lowers the minimum size of industrial sites that may be included in the Authority's site and building assessment program from 250 acres to 100 acres. The bill contains a technical amendment. This bill is identical to SB 976.
Title
Virginia Economic Development Partnership Authority; site and building assessment program, etc.
Sponsors
Del. Matthew James [D] | Del. Terry Austin [R] | Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. C.E. Hayes [D] |
Del. Steve Heretick [D] | Del. Joesph Lindsey [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-17 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0013) | |
2017-02-17 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 13 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-14 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 21, 2017 | |
2017-02-14 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/14/17 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-13 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-13 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1591ER) |
2017-02-13 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-01-23 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-23 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-20 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-01-19 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-17 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-11 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2017-01-02 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2017-01-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102591D |