VA HB1583 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0766)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0766)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Commonwealth Broadband Chief Advisor. Establishes the position of Commonwealth Broadband Chief Advisor (Chief Advisor) within the Office of the Secretary of Commerce and Trade to serve as Virginia's single point of contact and integration for broadband issues, efforts, and initiatives and to increase the availability and affordability of broadband throughout all regions of the Commonwealth. The Chief Advisor shall be designated by the Secretary of Commerce and Trade, and staff for the Chief Advisor shall be provided by the Center for Innovative Technology and the Department of Housing and Community Development.
Title
Commonwealth Broadband Chief Advisor; establishes position.
Sponsors
Del. Kathy Byron [R] | Del. Wendy Gooditis [D] | Del. Mark Keam [D] | Del. Margaret Ransone [R] |
Del. David Reid [D] | Del. Larry Rush [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-10 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 95-N) (Y: 0 N: 95 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 95-N) (Y: 0 N: 95 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0766) | |
2018-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 766 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-26 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 26, 2018 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1583ER) |
2018-03-20 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-10 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-10 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-10 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senators: McDougle, Stanley, Dance |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2018-03-08 | House | Delegates: Byron, Robinson, Bagby |
2018-03-08 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2018-03-08 | House | House acceded to request |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate insisted on amendments (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-06 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 95-N) |
2018-03-06 | House | Senate amendments rejected by House (0-Y 95-N) |
2018-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Hanger agreed to |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-13 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1583H1 |
2018-02-12 | House | Committee substitute from Appropriations agreed to 18107017D-H1 |
2018-02-12 | House | Committee amendments from Commerce and Labor rejected |
2018-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-09 | House | Committee substitute printed 18107017D-H1 |
2018-02-09 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-01 | House | Assigned App. sub: Commerce, Agriculture, Natural Resources & Technology |
2018-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-01-30 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-23 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-01-19 | House | Presented and ordered printed 18104536D |