VA HB1582 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0013)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0013)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Claims; David Wayne Kingrea; compensation for wrongful incarceration. Provides relief in the amount of $58,942 to David Wayne Kingrea, who was wrongly convicted of indecent liberties with a minor. Claims; David Wayne Kingrea; compensation for wrongful incarceration. Provides relief in the amount of $58,942 to David Wayne Kingrea, who was wrongly convicted of indecent liberties with a minor.
Title
Relief; Kingrea, David Wayne.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0013) | |
2023-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 13 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-02 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-02-22 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1582ER) |
2023-02-22 | House | Enrolled |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-02-03 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-02 | House | Printed as engrossed 23101643D-E |
2023-02-02 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1582E |
2023-02-02 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2023-02-02 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-30 | House | Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-16 | House | Assigned App. sub: General Government and Capital Outlay |
2023-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23101643D |