VA HB1577 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Duties of lien and secured creditors. Changes from 90 to 60 the number of days by which a secured creditor is required to submit for recording a satisfaction of a security instrument after the creditor receives full payment or performance of the secured obligation. The bill similarly changes from 90 to 60 the number of days by which a lien creditor is required, after full or partial payment or satisfaction has been made of a debt secured by a deed of trust, vendor's lien, or other lien, to provide a certificate of satisfaction to the settlement agent or deliver it to the clerk's office with the necessary fee for filing.
Title
Lien and secured creditors; duties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | House: Left in Courts of Justice | |
2011-01-12 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2011-01-10 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #2 Civil | |
2011-01-05 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-01-05 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102749D |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HB1577 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB1577+hil |