VA HB1576 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Real property tax assessments; arbitration. Permits the taxpayer to submit the valuation of an owner-occupied dwelling to binding arbitration in lieu of an appeal to court.
Title
Real property tax assessments; arbitration.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | House | Left in Finance |
2015-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2015-01-20 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2015-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2015-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101153D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 3330 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3331 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3984.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 581 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB1576 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB1576+hil |