VA HB1573 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-14 - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (8-Y 4-N 1-A)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-14 - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (8-Y 4-N 1-A)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Castle doctrine. Encodes a version of the "castle doctrine," allowing the use of physical force, including deadly force by a person in his dwelling, against an intruder in the dwelling who has committed an overt act against him or another person who is lawfully in the dwelling, without civil liability.
Title
Castle doctrine; encodes version allowing use of deadly force against an intruder in dwelling.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (8-Y 4-N 1-A) (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (75-Y 23-N) (Y: 77 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (16-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (75-Y 23-N) (Y: 77 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (16-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-14 | Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (8-Y 4-N 1-A) | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-02-08 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (75-Y 23-N) | |
2011-02-08 | House: Read third time and passed House (75-Y 23-N) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Printed as engrossed 11101224D-E | |
2011-02-07 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB1573E | |
2011-02-07 | House: Amendment by Delegate Morrissey rejected | |
2011-02-07 | House: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-06 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2011-02-06 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2011-02-04 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2011-02-03 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2011-02-02 | House: Read first time | |
2011-01-31 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (16-Y 5-N) | |
2011-01-17 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 3-N) | |
2011-01-12 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal | |
2011-01-05 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-01-05 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101224D |