VA HB1571 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0478)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0478)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Workers' compensation; fees for medical services. Provides that the pecuniary liability of an employer for a medical service provided for the treatment of a traumatic injury or serious burn includes liability for any professional service rendered during the dates of service of the admission or transfer to a Level I or Level II trauma center or to a burn center, as applicable. The measure increases the initial charge outlier threshold, which under the stop-loss feature allows hospitals to receive payments or reimbursements that exceed the fee schedule amount for certain claims, from 150 percent of the maximum fee for the service set forth in the applicable fee schedule to 300 percent of such amount. The measure allows the Workers' Compensation Commission to adjust the charge outlier threshold percentage; under existing law, it is allowed only to decrease the percentage. The measure also (i) expands the definition of codes, as used in the provision directing the Commission to establish fee schedules for scheduled medical services, to include revenue codes, which are defined in the bill; (ii) clarifies the definition of "HCPCS codes"; (iii) directs the Commission to use the regulatory advisory panel on all matters involving or related to the fee schedule as deemed necessary by the Commission; (iv) adds a definition of "new type of technology"; and (v) extends the deadline by which the regulatory advisory panel is required to meet, review, and make recommendations to the Commission from July 1, 2017, to July 1, 2018. The bill contains an emergency clause.
Title
Workers' compensation; fees for medical services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0478) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 478 (effective 3/13/17) | |
2017-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1571ER) |
2017-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-01-18 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-18 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-17 | House | Printed as engrossed 17102180D-E |
2017-01-17 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1571E |
2017-01-17 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2017-01-17 | House | Read second time |
2017-01-16 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-12 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2017-01-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/13/16 17102180D |