VA HB1563 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0516)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0516)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Sales and use tax; agricultural exemptions. Provides a sales and use tax exemption for property used to produce agricultural products for market in an indoor, closed, controlled-environment commercial agricultural facility. The property exempted includes (i) internal structural components required to create the necessary growing environment for plants, including watering systems, towers for growing plants, and lighting and air systems, and (ii) transparent elements of external structural components of such facilities, including windows, walls, and roofs, that allow sunlight in for the commercial production of agricultural products. The exemption shall not apply to property used in producing cannabis. The bill allows contractors working on behalf of owners of facilities exempt under these new provisions to use the exemption when purchasing materials that would otherwise qualify for the exemption.
Title
Sales and use tax; agricultural exemptions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (87-Y 11-N 2-A) (Y: 87 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (87-Y 11-N 2-A) (Y: 87 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0516) | |
2023-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 516 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-02-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-02-27 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 27, 2023 |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-02-14 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-02-14 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate reprinted (HB1563ER) |
2023-02-14 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1563ER) |
2023-02-14 | House | Enrolled |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Read third time |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-01-25 | House | VOTE: Passage (87-Y 11-N 2-A) |
2023-01-25 | House | Read third time and passed House (87-Y 11-N 2-A) |
2023-01-24 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1563H1 |
2023-01-24 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 23104837D-H1 |
2023-01-24 | House | Read second time |
2023-01-23 | House | Passed by for the day |
2023-01-20 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-18 | House | Committee substitute printed 23104837D-H1 |
2023-01-18 | House | Reported from Finance with substitute (18-Y 3-N) |
2023-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2023-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23102415D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1240 (Same As) 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0517)
SB1240 (Same As) 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0517)
SB1240 (Same As) 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0517)