VA HB1560 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0546)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0546)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Electronic summons systems; fees; towns. Allows towns to assess a fee not to exceed $5, as part of the costs in each criminal or traffic case in the district or circuit courts located where such cases are brought, to be used for the implementation and maintenance of an electronic summons system.
Title
Electronic summons systems; towns may assess an additional sum.
Sponsors
Del. Brenda Pogge [R] | Del. Thomas Rust [R] | Del. Mark Keam [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 2-N) (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (36-Y 2-N) (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed by for the day (0-Y 0-N) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 40 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (36-Y 2-N) (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed by for the day (0-Y 0-N) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 40 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0546) | |
2015-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 546 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-10 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/10/15 |
2015-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1560ER) |
2015-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-24 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 2-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 15105233D-S2 (93-Y 2-N) |
2015-02-23 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (36-Y 2-N) |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1560S2 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15105233D-S2 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Committee substitute rejected 151050440-S1 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15105233D-S2 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (11-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15105044D-S1 |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-03 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-02 | House | Printed as engrossed 15101955D-E |
2015-02-02 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1560E |
2015-02-02 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2015-02-02 | House | Read second time |
2015-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-28 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (21-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-13 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2015-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101955D |
Same As/Similar To
SB888 (Same As) 2015-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0643)