VA HB1552 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 18 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Tethering animals; adequate shelter and space. Provides that the outdoor tethering of an animal does not meet the requirement of adequate shelter during a hurricane warning or tropical storm warning or if the animal is not safe from predators or well suited or equipped to tolerate its environment. The bill provides that unless an animal control officer has inspected an animal's individual circumstances and determined it to be safe from predators and well suited and equipped to tolerate its environment, no such outdoor tethering during a heat advisory, a severe weather warning, or a period when the temperature is 85 degrees Fahrenheit or higher or 32 degrees Fahrenheit or lower shall constitute the provision of adequate shelter. The measure increases the minimum tether length required to constitute adequate space to 15 feet in length or four times the length of the animal, whichever is greater. Current law requires the tether to be at least 10 feet in length or three times the length of the animal, whichever is greater. The bill provides an exception for a case in which an animal control officer, having inspected an animal's individual circumstances, determines that a shorter tether of at least 10 feet or three times the length of the animal makes the animal safer, more suited, and better equipped to tolerate its environment than a longer tether would.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tethering animals; adequate shelter and space.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (53-Y 42-N) (Y: 52 N: 42 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (28-Y 11-N) (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request for second conference committee (28-Y 10-N) (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate requested second conference committee (28-Y 12-N) (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (49-Y 47-N) (Y: 48 N: 47 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) (Y: 0 N: 98 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (19-Y 17-N) (Y: 18 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (8-Y 5-N) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (64-Y 33-N) (Y: 63 N: 33 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-20HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020
2020-03-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-18SenateSigned by President
2020-03-18HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1552ER)
2020-03-18HouseEnrolled
2020-03-08HouseVOTE: Adoption (53-Y 42-N)
2020-03-08HouseConference report agreed to by House (53-Y 42-N)
2020-03-07HouseSecond Conference substitute printed 20109930D-H3
2020-03-07HouseDelegates: Levine, Gooditis, Fariss
2020-03-07HouseSecond conferees appointed by House
2020-03-07SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (28-Y 11-N)
2020-03-07SenateSenators: Marsden, Favola, Pillion
2020-03-07SenateSecond conferees appointed by Senate
2020-03-07SenateSenate acceded to request for second conference committee (28-Y 10-N)
2020-03-07HouseMotion for second committee of conference agreed to
2020-03-07SenateSenate requested second conference committee (28-Y 12-N)
2020-03-07SenateConference report rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N)
2020-03-05HouseVOTE: Adoption (49-Y 47-N)
2020-03-05HouseConference report agreed to by House (49-Y 47-N)
2020-03-05HouseFirst Conference substitute printed 20109714D-H2
2020-03-05 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2020-03-05SenateSenators: Marsden, Favola, Pillion
2020-03-05SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2020-03-04HouseDelegates: Levine, Gooditis, Fariss
2020-03-04HouseConferees appointed by House
2020-03-04HouseHouse acceded to request
2020-03-03SenateSenate requested conference committee
2020-03-03SenateSenate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2020-03-02HouseVOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N)
2020-03-02HouseSenate substitute rejected by House 20109122D-S1 (0-Y 99-N)
2020-03-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-28SenatePassed Senate with substitute (19-Y 17-N)
2020-02-28SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1552S1
2020-02-28SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20109122D-S1
2020-02-28SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-28SenateRead third time
2020-02-27SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-25SenateCommittee substitute printed 20109122D-S1
2020-02-25SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (8-Y 5-N)
2020-02-17SenateAssigned ACNR sub: Companion Animals
2020-02-12SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2020-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-11HouseVOTE: Passage (64-Y 33-N)
2020-02-11HouseRead third time and passed House (64-Y 33-N)
2020-02-10HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1552H1
2020-02-10HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20107749D-H1
2020-02-10HouseRead second time
2020-02-07HousePassed by for the day
2020-02-06HouseRead first time
2020-02-05HouseCommittee substitute printed 20107749D-H1
2020-02-05HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (12-Y 10-N)
2020-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N)
2020-01-15HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Agriculture
2020-01-11HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2020-01-11HousePresented and ordered printed 20105457D

Same As/Similar To

SB272 (Same As) 2020-03-20 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
326500(n/a)See Bill Text
326543(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB1552
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1552+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1552H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1552S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1552H2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1552H3+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1552ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0101V0020+HB1552
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H01V0147+HB1552
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0889+HB1552
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S01V0123+HB1552
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1203HB1552+HB1552
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1291HB1552+HB1552
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1660+HB1552
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1413HB1552+HB1552
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1911+HB1552
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1735HB1552+HB1552
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1736HB1552+HB1552
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1803HB1552+HB1552
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1804HB1552+HB1552
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV2118+HB1552

Bill Comments

feedback