VA SB272 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 18 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Tethering animals; adequate shelter and space. Provides that the outdoor tethering of an animal does not meet the requirement of adequate shelter during a hurricane warning or tropical storm warning or if the animal is not safe from predators or well suited or equipped to tolerate its environment. The bill provides that unless an animal control officer has inspected an animal's individual circumstances and determined it to be safe from predators and well suited and equipped to tolerate its environment, no such outdoor tethering during a heat advisory, a severe weather warning, or a period when the temperature is 85 degrees Fahrenheit or higher or 32 degrees Fahrenheit or lower shall constitute the provision of adequate shelter. The measure increases the minimum tether length required to constitute adequate space to 15 feet in length or four times the length of the animal, whichever is greater. Current law requires the tether to be at least 10 feet in length or three times the length of the animal, whichever is greater. The bill provides an exception for a case in which an animal control officer, having inspected an animal's individual circumstances, determines that a shorter tether of at least 10 feet or three times the length of the animal makes the animal safer, more suited, and better equipped to tolerate its environment than a longer tether would.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tethering animals; adequate shelter and space.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (26-Y 13-N) (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (51-Y 44-N) (Y: 50 N: 44 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (54-Y 41-N) (Y: 53 N: 41 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate requested second conference committee (27-Y 11-N 1-A) (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report rejected by Senate (3-Y 36-N) (Y: 3 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (29-Y 10-N) (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N 1-A) (Y: 0 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (66-Y 32-N) (Y: 65 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (19-Y 19-N 1-A) (Y: 18 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (7-Y 6-N 2-A) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-20SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020
2020-03-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-18SenateSigned by President
2020-03-18SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB272ER)
2020-03-18SenateEnrolled
2020-03-08SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (26-Y 13-N)
2020-03-08HouseVOTE: Adoption (51-Y 44-N)
2020-03-08HouseConference report agreed to by House (51-Y 44-N)
2020-03-08SenateSenators: Bell, Favola, Pillion
2020-03-08SenateSecond conferees appointed by Senate
2020-03-07SenateSecond Conference substitute printed 20109923D-S2
2020-03-07SenateSenators: Bell, Favola, Pillion
2020-03-07SenateSecond conferees appointed by Senate
2020-03-07HouseDelegates: Levine, Gooditis, Fariss
2020-03-07HouseSecond conferees appointed by House
2020-03-07HouseHouse acceded to request for second conference committee
2020-03-07SenateSenate requested second conference committee (27-Y 11-N 1-A)
2020-03-07SenateConference report rejected by Senate (3-Y 36-N)
2020-03-07HouseVOTE: Adoption (54-Y 41-N)
2020-03-07HouseConference report agreed to by House (54-Y 41-N)
2020-03-05SenateFirst Conference substitute printed 20109609D-S1
2020-03-05 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2020-03-05HouseDelegates: Levine, Gooditis, Fariss
2020-03-05HouseConferees appointed by House
2020-03-05SenateSenators: Bell, Favola, Pillion
2020-03-05SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2020-03-05SenateSenate acceded to request (29-Y 10-N)
2020-03-05HouseHouse requested conference committee
2020-03-05HouseHouse insisted on substitute
2020-03-05SenateHouse substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N 1-A)
2020-03-02HouseVOTE: Passage (66-Y 32-N)
2020-03-02HousePassed House with substitute (66-Y 32-N)
2020-03-02HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB272H1
2020-03-02HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20109173D-H1
2020-03-02HouseRead third time
2020-02-28HouseRead second time
2020-02-26HouseCommittee substitute printed 20109173D-H1
2020-02-26HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (14-Y 8-N)
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2020-02-13HouseRead first time
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-10SenateChair votes Yes
2020-02-10SenateRead third time and passed Senate (19-Y 19-N 1-A)
2020-02-07SenatePrinted as engrossed 20103262D-E
2020-02-07SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB272E
2020-02-07SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2020-02-07SenateReading of amendments waived
2020-02-07SenateRead second time
2020-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-04SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (7-Y 6-N 2-A)
2020-01-29SenateAssigned ACNR sub: Companion Animals
2020-01-03SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2020-01-03SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103262D

Same As/Similar To

HB1552 (Same As) 2020-03-20 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
326500(n/a)See Bill Text
326543(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB272&201+sum+SB272
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB272+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB272E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB272H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB272S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB272S2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB272ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S01V0046+SB0272
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0382SB0272+SB0272
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0433SB0272+SB0272
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H01V0252+SB0272
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1705+SB0272
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1549SB0272+SB0272
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1644SB0272+SB0272
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1815SB0272+SB0272
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1816SB0272+SB0272
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV2055+SB0272
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV2113+SB0272
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1881SB0272+SB0272

Bill Comments

feedback