VA HB1552 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0710)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Board of Workforce Development; pilot program. Directs the Virginia Board of Workforce Development to recommend strategies to identify and engage discouraged workers and unemployed individuals not currently served by the workforce system and measurably improve the performance of federal Workforce Innovation and Opportunity Act of 2014 Title 1 Youth programs so they lead to improved employability and the development of skills to enter the workforce in a high-demand field. The Board shall report on the recommended strategies by October 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workforce Development, Virginia Board of; strategies to identify and engage certain persons.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-30 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0710)
2018-03-30 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 710 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-03-14 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-14HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 14, 2018
2018-03-08SenateSigned by President
2018-03-05HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-05HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1552ER)
2018-03-05HouseEnrolled
2018-03-01SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-03-01SenateRead third time
2018-02-28SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-26SenateReported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N)
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2018-02-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-13HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
2018-02-13HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2018-02-12HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1552H1
2018-02-12HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 18106098D-H1
2018-02-12HouseRead second time
2018-02-10HouseRead first time
2018-02-08HouseCommittee substitute printed 18106098D-H1
2018-02-08HouseReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
2018-02-01HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2018-01-23HouseAssigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-01-19HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2018-01-19HousePresented and ordered printed 18105085D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB1552
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1552+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1552H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1552ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0710+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H1401V0022+HB1552
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H14V0048+HB1552
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0701+HB1552
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S02V0152+HB1552
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0749HB1552+HB1552
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0804HB1552+HB1552

Bill Comments

feedback