VA HB1551 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0864)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0864)
Summary
Vehicle overweight and overload permits; fee structure. Requires the Department of Transportation, in consultation with the Department of Motor Vehicles, to review the current fee structure applied to overload and overweight vehicles. From July 1, 2008, to June 30, 2009, the annual overweight permit fee will be $265.
Title
Overweight and overload permits; creates fee schedules therefor to help recover maintenance costs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0864) | |
2008-04-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 864 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-04-23 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2008-04-23 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2008-04-23 | House: Reenrolled bill text (HB1551ER2) | |
2008-04-23 | House: Reenrolled | |
2008-04-23 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2008-04-23 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-04-23 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 2-N) | |
2008-04-23 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (95-Y 2-N) | |
2008-04-22 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-04-11 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2008-03-09 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-06 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-06 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1551ER) | |
2008-03-06 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-02-12 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-12 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read third time and passed House (95-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-11 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1551H1 | |
2008-02-11 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 083834436-H1 | |
2008-02-11 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-08 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-07 | House: Committee substitute printed 083834436-H1 | |
2008-02-07 | House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (20-Y 1-N) | |
2008-01-25 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: 3 | |
2008-01-18 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2008-01-18 | House: Presented and ordered printed 083498828 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB1551 |