VA HB155 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
General Assembly Conflicts of Interests Act; disclosure of tax credits; penalty. Requires the disclosure on the General Assembly Conflicts of Interests Act Statement of Economic Interests form of any tax credit allowed under the Code of Virginia that (i) the filer, (ii) a member of the filer's immediate family, (iii) a business owned by the filer or a member of the filer's immediate family, or (iv) a business in which the filer or a member of the filer's immediate family owns or controls an interest in excess of $5,000 claimed during the previous tax year, when the amount claimed is $1,000 or more. Disclosure of certain tax credits is not required. Disclosure is required only on the semiannual statement that is filed in June.
Title
General Assembly Conflicts of Interests Act; disclosure of tax credits, penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2016-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-01-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Ethics |
2015-12-22 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-12-22 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100916D |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB155 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB155+hil |