VA HB1548 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
Pending: Senate General Laws and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Common interest communities; Virginia Condominium Act; termination of condominium; respective interests of unit owners. Provides that the respective interests of condominium unit owners upon the termination of a condominium shall be as set forth in the termination agreement, unless the method of determining such respective interests is other than the relative fair market values, in which case the association shall provide each unit owner with a notice stating the result of that method for the unit owner's unit and, no later than 30 days after transmission of that notice, any unit owner disputing the interest to be distributed to his unit may require that the association obtain an independent appraisal of the condominium units. The bill provides a method of adjusting the respective interests of the unit owners if the amount of such independent appraisal of an objecting unit owner's unit is at least 10 percent more than the amount stated in the association's notice.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Common interest communities; termination of condominium, respective interests of unit owners.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (81-Y 18-N) (Y: 81 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-10SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2020-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-07HouseVOTE: Passage (81-Y 18-N)
2020-02-07HouseRead third time and passed House (81-Y 18-N)
2020-02-06HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1548H1
2020-02-06HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20107125D-H1
2020-02-06HouseRead second time
2020-02-05HouseRead first time
2020-02-04HouseReported from General Laws with substitute (18-Y 3-N)
2020-02-04HouseCommittee substitute printed 20107125D-H1
2020-01-30HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N)
2020-01-15HouseAssigned GL sub: Housing/Consumer Protection
2020-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2020-01-10HousePresented and ordered printed 20104355D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5511937(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback