VA HB1542 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0461)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0461)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State Trails Advisory Committee established. Establishes an advisory committee of the Department of Conservation and Recreation to assist in developing and implementing a statewide system of attractive, sustainable, connected, and enduring trails for the perpetual use and enjoyment of citizens. The bill has a sunset date of January 1, 2021.
Title
State Trails Advisory Committee; established, report, sunset provision.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (75-Y 19-N) (Y: 75 N: 21 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (77-Y 19-N) (Y: 77 N: 21 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (77-Y 19-N) (Y: 77 N: 21 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0461) | |
2015-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 461 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-10 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/10/15 |
2015-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1542ER) |
2015-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-25 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (75-Y 19-N) |
2015-02-25 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (75-Y 19-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-09 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (77-Y 19-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Read third time and passed House (77-Y 19-N) |
2015-02-06 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-04 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-19 | House | Assigned ACNRsub: Natural Resources |
2015-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2015-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100865D |