VA HB1541 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-27 - Defeated by Senate (17-Y 22-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-27 - Defeated by Senate (17-Y 22-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; limited mixed beverage license for retail cigar shops. Creates a new limited mixed beverage license for retail cigar shops. The bill sets out the privileges of this new license, including a requirement that at least 60 percent of the licensee's annual gross revenue be from the sale of premium tobacco products. The bill also defines "cigar shop" and sets out the state and local license taxes for this license.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; creates a new limited mixed beverage license for retail cigar shops.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Defeated by Senate (17-Y 22-N) (Y: 17 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 3-N 3-A) (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 3-N 3-A) (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | Senate | Defeated by Senate (17-Y 22-N) |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (8-Y 6-N) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-13 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 3-N 3-A) |
2018-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House (94-Y 3-N 3-A) |
2018-02-12 | House | Printed as engrossed 18104475D-E |
2018-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1541E |
2018-02-12 | House | Amendment by Delegate Simon rejected |
2018-02-12 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2018-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-08 | House | Reported from General Laws with amendments (21-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-24 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2018-01-19 | House | Presented and ordered printed 18104475D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
4 | 1 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 210 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 231 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 233 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |