VA HB1537 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1537
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-01 - Continued to 2025 in Rules by voice vote
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-01 - Continued to 2025 in Rules by voice vote
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
JLARC; Department of Human Resource Management; Grievance Procedure Manual; report. Directs the Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission (JLARC) to conduct a review of the Department of Human Resource Management's Grievance Procedure Manual as it relates to the Department of Corrections and Department of Juvenile Justice. The bill requires that JLARC evaluate the effectiveness of such procedures and report its findings and recommendations to the Chairmen of the Senate Committee on General Laws and Technology and the House Committee on General Laws by November 1, 2024.
Title
JLARC; Department of Human Resource Management's Grievance Procedure Manual, report.
Sponsors
Del. Debra Gardner [D] | Del. Nadarius Clark [D] | Del. Kelly Convirs-Fowler [D] | Del. Rozia Henson [D] |
Del. Shelly Simonds [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | House | Continued to 2025 in Rules by voice vote |
2024-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2025 by voice vote |
2024-01-25 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies Subcommittee |
2024-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2024-01-19 | House | Presented and ordered printed 24104829D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1537 (Carry Over) 2024-02-01 - Continued to 2025 in Rules by voice vote
Subjects
Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission (JLARC)
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Uncodified Legislation
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Uncodified Legislation
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+sum+HB1537 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+ful+HB1537+hil |