VA HB1534 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Loan repayment programs; mental health professionals. Creates a loan repayment program for persons who have worked as mental health professionals in the Commonwealth for at least five years.
Title
Loan repayment programs; creates program for mental health professionals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2023-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2023-01-24 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2023-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-01-24 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (17-Y 5-N) |
2023-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-16 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2023-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2023-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23101851D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 1 | 122.6:2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 122.8 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |