VA HB1532 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0777)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0777)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Fire Programs Fund. Increases the share of certain moneys in the Fire Programs Fund to be allocated to localities for the improvement of volunteer and career fire services from 75 percent to 80 percent. The measure does not become effective unless it is reenacted by the 2018 Session of the General Assembly.
Title
Fire Programs Fund; increases rate of assessment for Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 2-N) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 2-N) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (16-Y 4-N) (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 2-N) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 2-N) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (16-Y 4-N) (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0777) | |
2017-04-05 | House | Enacted, Chapter 777 (effective - see bill) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2017-04-05 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2017-04-05 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB1532ER2) |
2017-04-05 | House | Reenrolled |
2017-04-05 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-04-05 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 2-N) |
2017-04-05 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (96-Y 2-N) |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-03-24 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2017-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17 |
2017-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1532ER) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-01-23 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 2-N) |
2017-01-23 | House | Read third time and passed House (97-Y 2-N) |
2017-01-20 | House | Printed as engrossed 17102058D-E |
2017-01-20 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1532E |
2017-01-20 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-01-20 | House | Read second time |
2017-01-19 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-17 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (16-Y 4-N) |
2016-12-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2016-12-27 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102058D |