VA HB1531 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Hampton Roads Interstate Highway Corridor Improvement Program and Fund; sales and use tax; Planning District 23. Creates the Hampton Roads Interstate Highway Corridor Improvement Program for the purpose of making infrastructure and safety improvements to highway corridors surrounding and paralleling interstate highways in Planning District 23. The program is funded by an additional 0.30 percent retail sales and use tax levied and imposed in Planning District 23. The bill provides that moneys generated by such tax shall be deposited in the Hampton Roads Interstate Highway Corridor Improvement Fund, created by the bill.
Title
Hampton Roads Interstate Highway Corridor Improvement Program and Fund; established and created.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | Left in Transportation |
2023-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 3-N) |
2023-01-16 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2 Transportation Infrastructure and Funding |
2023-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2023-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23101122D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 2 | 2600.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 603.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |