VA HB153 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0654)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0654)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Workers' Compensation; exclusion of certain employees. Excludes a person who suffers an injury on or after July 1, 2012, from coverage under the Virginia Workers' Compensation Act if there is jurisdiction under either the Longshore and Harbor Workers' Compensation Act or the Merchant Marine Act of 1920. The measure provides that the Workers' Compensation Act will not be construed to eliminate or diminish any right that a person or his personal representative may have under either of such federal acts.
Title
Workers' compensation; exclusion of certain employees.
Sponsors
Del. Lee Ware [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (20-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (9-Y 5-N 1-A) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (70-Y 26-N 1-A) (Y: 72 N: 26 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (16-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 2-N) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (9-Y 5-N 1-A) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (70-Y 26-N 1-A) (Y: 72 N: 26 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (16-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 2-N) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0654) | |
2012-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 654 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-03-07 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-05 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-05 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB153ER) | |
2012-03-05 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Passed Senate (20-Y 19-N) | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Passed by temporarily | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-22 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-20 | Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (9-Y 5-N 1-A) | |
2012-02-07 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2012-02-07 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-06 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (70-Y 26-N 1-A) | |
2012-02-06 | House: Read third time and passed House (70-Y 26-N 1-A) | |
2012-02-03 | House: Printed as engrossed 12100823D-E | |
2012-02-03 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB153E | |
2012-02-03 | House: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2012-02-03 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-02 | House: Read first time | |
2012-01-31 | House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (16-Y 5-N) | |
2012-01-24 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 2-N) | |
2012-01-17 | House: Assigned C & L sub: #1 | |
2012-01-05 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2012-01-05 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100823D |