VA HB1528 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; tastings conducted by manufacturers, wine and beer wholesalers, and authorized representatives. Increases the amount allowed to be spent on the purchase of alcoholic beverages used in a tasting conducted by manufacturers, wine and beer wholesalers, and authorized representatives from $100 to $250. The bill also provides that, as a condition of conducting the tasting, a wholesaler or the retail licensee on whose premises the tasting is conducted is not required by agreement or otherwise to pay for the purchase of the alcoholic beverage products used in the tasting.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; tastings conducted by manufacturers, wine and beer wholesalers, reps.
Sponsors
Del. David Albo [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | House | Left in General Laws |
2017-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-16 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2016-12-26 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2016-12-26 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102365D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB1528 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1528+hil |