VA HB1524 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0718)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0718)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Board of Medicine; regulations related to retention of patient records; time. Requires health care practitioners licensed by the Board of Medicine to maintain health records for a minimum of six years following the last patient encounter. The bill also provides that practitioners are not required to maintain health records for longer than 12 years from the date of creation except for (i) health records of a minor child, which shall be maintained until the patient reaches the age of 18 or becomes emancipated, with a minimum of six years following the last patient encounter, and (ii) health records that are required by contractual obligation or federal law to be maintained longer.
Title
Health record retention; practitioners to maintain records for a minimum of six years.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 3-N) (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 3-N) (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0718) | |
2018-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 718 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-16 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-16 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 16, 2018 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-08 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1524ER) |
2018-03-08 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-06 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-06 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 18107775D-S1 (96-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1524S1 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 18107775D-S1 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18107775D-S1 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Professions |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-12 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 3-N) |
2018-02-12 | House | Read third time and passed House (96-Y 3-N) |
2018-02-09 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1524H1 |
2018-02-09 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 18106681D-H1 |
2018-02-09 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-06 | House | Committee substitute printed 18106681D-H1 |
2018-02-06 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-22 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2018-01-19 | House | Presented and ordered printed 18104448D |