VA HB1513 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Possession or distribution of psilocybin for certain medical purposes permitted; penalty. Allows possession of psilocybin pursuant to a valid prescription or order issued by a health care practitioner in the course of his professional practice for treatment of refractory depression or post-traumatic stress disorder or to ameliorate end-of-life anxiety. The bill prohibits prosecution of health care practitioners or pharmacists for dispensing or distributing psilocybin for such purposes. The bill makes possession of psilocybin without a valid prescription a Class 2 misdemeanor punishable by no longer than 30 days in jail and no more than a $500 fine, either or both. The bill makes a second or subsequent offense a Class 1 misdemeanor.
Title
Psilocybin; possession or distribution for certain medical purposes permitted, penalty.
Sponsors
Del. Dawn Adams [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2023-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2023-01-17 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2023-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2023-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23101934D |