VA HB1513 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Personal appearance by two-way electronic video and audio communication. Requires any court to use two-way electronic video and audio communication, if available, in any pre-trial proceeding to determine bail or representation by counsel that would otherwise require the transportation of a person in order to appear in person before the court. Under current law, only district courts are required to use such communication to conduct these pre-trial proceedings and only if the person would have to be transported from outside the jurisdiction of the court conducting the proceeding.
Title
Personal appearance by two-way electronic video and audio communication.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2017-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-27 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2017-01-26 | House | Rereferred to Courts of Justice |
2017-01-26 | House | Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to |
2017-01-26 | House | Read second time |
2017-01-25 | House | Passed by for the day |
2017-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-20 | House | Committee substitute printed 17104309D-H1 |
2017-01-20 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (11-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-13 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2016-12-21 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-12-21 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102191D |