VA HB1513 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 17 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 17 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Transient occupancy tax; Arlington County. Extends the sunset date for the additional transient occupancy tax in Arlington County from January 1, 2012, to January 1, 2015. Current law requires that the revenues from the tax be designated and spent for promoting tourism and business travel in the county.
Title
Transient occupancy tax; extends sunset date provision for additional tax in Arlington County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | House: Left in Finance | |
2011-01-31 | House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) | |
2011-01-17 | House: Assigned Finance sub: #2 | |
2010-12-17 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2010-12-17 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102436D |