VA HB1509 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0004)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0004)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Mineral mines reclamation; bonds and liens. Increases, from a range of $200 to $1,000 per acre to a fixed amount of $3,000 per acre, the mandatory bond amount furnished by operators on mining land. The bill increases the minimum size of the Minerals Reclamation Fund from $250,000 to $2 million. The bill also grants the Commonwealth a lien on property owned by the operator and reclaimed by the Director of the Department of Mines, Minerals and Energy and sets out the process by which the Director shall perfect or waive the lien.
Title
Mineral mines reclamation; bonds and liens.
Sponsors
Del. Lee Ware [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 10-N) (Y: 88 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 10-N) (Y: 88 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0004) | |
2017-02-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 4 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-09 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 16, 2017 | |
2017-02-09 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/9/17 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-08 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1509ER) |
2017-02-08 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-01-30 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 10-N) |
2017-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House (88-Y 10-N) |
2017-01-27 | House | Printed as engrossed 17101267D-E |
2017-01-27 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1509E |
2017-01-27 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2017-01-27 | House | Read second time |
2017-01-26 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-25 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (20-Y 2-N) |
2017-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-12 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources |
2016-12-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2016-12-20 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101267D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
45 | 1 | 183 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 1 | 185 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 1 | 186.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 1 | 186.8 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 1 | 197.10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 1 | 197.14 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 1 | 197.18 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 1 | 197.8 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |