VA HB1509 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 17 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 17 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Employment; prohibit discrimination based on sexual orientation. Prohibits discrimination in employment based on sexual orientation.
Title
Employment; prohibits discrimination based on sexual orientation.
Sponsors
Del. James Scott [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | House: Left in General Laws | |
2011-02-01 | House: Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB2046-Ebbin) by voice vote | |
2011-01-17 | House: Assigned GL sub: #4 Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process | |
2010-12-17 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2010-12-17 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100590D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 1501.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 1507 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 1604 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2639 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2901.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3004 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3900 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3901 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HB1509 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB1509+hil |