VA HB1498 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 2 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-28 - Passed by indefinitely in Education by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 2 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-28 - Passed by indefinitely in Education by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
School expulsions; reversal. Removes a provision prohibiting the reversal of a decision to expel a student on the grounds that certain enumerated factors were not considered.
Title
School expulsions; removes provision prohibiting reversal of decision.
Sponsors
Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-28 | House | Passed by indefinitely in Education by voice vote |
2013-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-11 | House | Assigned Education sub: Students and Early Education |
2013-01-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2013-01-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13100104D |