VA HB1494 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Suspected adult abuse, neglect, or exploitation; mandated reporting; vulnerable adults. Provides that for the purpose of mandated reporting of suspected adult abuse, neglect, or exploitation, "adult" means any person age 18 or older, regardless of capacity, and requires reporting of suspected abuse, neglect, or exploitation of any vulnerable adult. Currently, reporting is required in cases of suspected abuse, neglect, or exploitation of an adult who is (i) 60 years of age or older or (ii) 18 years of age or older and incapacitated. The bill also directs the Department of Social Services to develop a definition of "vulnerable adult" and to report its recommendation regarding such definition to the Chairmen of the House Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions and the Senate Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services by December 1, 2018. Except for the reporting requirement, the bill has a delayed effective date of July 1, 2019.
Title
Suspected adult abuse, neglect, or exploitation; mandated reporting, vulnerable adults.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2018-02-06 | House | Rereferred to Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2018-02-06 | House | Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to |
2018-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-01 | House | Committee substitute printed 18106570D-H1 |
2018-02-01 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2018-01-18 | House | Presented and ordered printed 18105047D |